NM HB184 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-09 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-09 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Apprenticeship Program Income Tax Credits
Title
Apprenticeship Program Income Tax Credits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-09 | Senate | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Sent to SFC - Referrals: SFC |
2019-03-08 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:51 N:11 |
2019-03-07 | House | HTRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-01 | House | HLVMC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-17 | House | Sent to HLVMC - Referrals: HLVMC/HTRC |
2019-01-15 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |