NM HB181 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-19 - [LD 34] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 41
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-19 - [LD 34] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 41
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Uniform Partition Of Heirs Property Act
Title
Uniform Partition Of Heirs Property Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-19 | House | [LD 34] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 41 |
2017-02-19 | Senate | [LD 34] Passed Senate (40-0) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | [LD 32] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-16 | Senate | [LD 31] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-02-16 | Senate | [LD 31] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-07 | Senate | [LD 22] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2017-02-07 | Senate | [LD 22] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] Passed House (65-0) |
2017-01-24 | House | [LD 8] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-20 | House | [LD 4] Referred to House Judiciary |
2017-01-20 | House | [LD 4] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-18 | House | [LD 2] Referred to House Business & Industry |
2017-01-18 | House | [LD 2] Assigned to House Business & Industry and then to House Judiciary |