NM HB18 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 47] Passed Senate (41-0) Signed by one or both houses (Apr.1) Ch. 82.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 47] Passed Senate (41-0) Signed by one or both houses (Apr.1) Ch. 82.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Drinking water system financing
Title
Drinking water system financing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | Senate | [LD 47] Passed Senate (41-0) Signed by one or both houses (Apr.1) Ch. 82. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-27 | Senate | [LD 32] Referred to Senate Finance |
2013-02-27 | Senate | [LD 32] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-12 | Senate | [LD 21] Referred to Senate Conservation |
2013-02-12 | Senate | [LD 21] Assigned to Senate Conservation and then to Senate Finance |
2013-02-25 | House | [LD 30] Passed House (67-0) |
2013-02-21 | House | [LD 28] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-28 | House | [LD 10] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2013-01-28 | House | [LD 10] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-16 | House | [LD 2] Referred to House Transportation & Public Works |
2013-01-16 | House | [LD 2] Assigned to House Transportation & Public Works and then to House Appropriations & Finance |
2013-01-15 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |