NM HB178 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-13 - [LD 28] Referred to Senate Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-13 - [LD 28] Referred to Senate Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School Funds For Bus Passes For Students
Title
School Funds For Bus Passes For Students
Sponsors
Rep. Alonzo Baldonado [R] | Rep. Stephanie Richard [D] | Rep. Jimmie Hall [R] | Rep. Dennis Roch [R] |
Rep. Andres Romero [D] | Rep. Tomas Salazar [D] | Rep. Carl Trujillo [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-13 | Senate | [LD 28] Referred to Senate Finance |
2017-02-13 | Senate | [LD 28] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-09 | Senate | [LD 24] Referred to Senate Education |
2017-02-09 | Senate | [LD 24] Assigned to Senate Education and then to Senate Finance |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] Passed House (63-1) |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-22 | House | [LD 6] Referred to House Education |
2017-01-22 | House | [LD 6] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-18 | House | [LD 2] Referred to House Transportation & Public Works |
2017-01-18 | House | [LD 2] Assigned to House Transportation & Public Works and then to House Education |