NM HB174 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Pocket Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Custodial Memory Care Facility Gross Receipts

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Custodial Memory Care Facility Gross Receipts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-15 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20HousePocket Veto
2020-02-20SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:39 N:0
2020-02-20SenateSFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2020-02-16SenateSent to SFC - Referrals: SFC
2020-02-15HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:63 N:0
2020-02-14HouseHTRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2020-02-03HouseHHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2020-01-24HouseSent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC/HTRC
2020-01-21HouseSent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback