NM HB171 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-28 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 11 - Feb. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-28 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 11 - Feb. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Rural Air Svc. Enhancement Grant Changes
Title
Rural Air Svc. Enhancement Grant Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-28 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 11 - Feb. 28 |
2022-02-17 | House | House has concurred with Senate Amendments |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:39 N:0 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment |
2022-02-15 | Senate | STBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2022-02-13 | Senate | Sent to STBTC - Referrals: STBTC |
2022-02-12 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:67 N:0 |
2022-02-11 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2022-02-03 | House | HTPWC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2022-01-31 | House | Sent to HTPWC - Referrals: HTPWC/HAFC |