NM HB170 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 29 - Mar. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Extend Small Business Saturday

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extend Small Business Saturday

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-15 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20HouseSigned by Governor - Chapter 29 - Mar. 4
2020-02-20SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:32 N:3
2020-02-17SenateSCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2020-02-15SenateSent to SCORC - Referrals: SCORC
2020-02-15HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:65 N:1
2020-02-15HouseHouse of Representatives Floor Amendment
2020-02-12HouseHTRC: Reported by committee without a recommendation
2020-02-03HouseHCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2020-01-24HouseSent to HCEDC - Referrals: HCEDC/HTRC
2020-01-21HouseSent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback