NM HB17 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-03 - [LD 16] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-03 - [LD 16] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Veteran Definition For Tuition
Title
Veteran Definition For Tuition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-03 | House | [LD 16] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 4 |
2016-02-03 | House | [LD 16] h and then to cncrd |
2016-02-05 | Senate | [LD 18] Passed Senate (39-0) |
2016-02-05 | Senate | [LD 18] Floor amendment adopted |
2016-02-04 | Senate | [LD 17] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-30 | Senate | [LD 12] Referred to Senate Education |
2016-01-30 | Senate | [LD 12] Assigned to Senate Education and then to Senate Public Affairs |
2016-01-26 | House | [LD 8] Passed House (58-0) |
2016-01-24 | House | [LD 6] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2016-01-22 | House | [LD 4] Referred to House Education |
2016-01-22 | House | [LD 4] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2016-01-20 | House | [LD 2] Referred to House Government, Elections & Indian Affairs |
2016-01-20 | House | [LD 2] Assigned to House Government, Elections & Indian Affairs and then to House Education |
2016-01-20 | House | [LD 2] Assigned to |
2016-01-20 | House | [LD 2] Printed |
2016-01-20 | House | [LD 2] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] Not Printed |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |