NM HB167 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 48 - Mar. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 48 - Mar. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Tribe & Pueblo Car Excise Tax Credit
Title
Tribe & Pueblo Car Excise Tax Credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 48 - Mar. 8 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:25 N:14 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Sent to SFC - Referrals: SFC |
2022-02-10 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:64 N:1 |
2022-02-07 | House | HTRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2022-02-01 | House | HGEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2022-01-28 | House | Sent to HGEIC - Referrals: HGEIC/HTRC |