NM HB167 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 14 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Periodic License Plate Replacement

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Periodic License Plate Replacement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HouseVetoed by Governor
2019-03-14SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:35 N:2
2019-03-08SenateSFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-03-05SenateSCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-02-21SenateSent to SCORC - Referrals: SCORC/SFC
2019-02-20HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:39 N:21
2019-02-20HouseHouse of Representatives Floor Amendment
2019-02-13HouseWithdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
2019-02-05HouseHTPWC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2019-01-17HouseSent to HTPWC - Referrals: HTPWC/HAFC
2019-01-15HouseSent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback