NM HB163 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Community Supplemental Support Fund
Title
Community Supplemental Support Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Sent to SFC - Referrals: SFC |
2020-02-12 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:49 N:15 |
2020-02-08 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-02-05 | House | HCPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2020-01-24 | House | Sent to HCPAC - Referrals: HCPAC/HAFC |
2020-01-21 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |