NM HB160 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-05 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 143 - Apr. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-05 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 143 - Apr. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Broadband Infrastructure
Title
Broadband Infrastructure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-05 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 143 - Apr. 5 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:40 N:0 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-03-08 | Senate | STBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Sent to STBTC - Referrals: STBTC/SJC |
2023-02-20 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:66 N:0 |
2023-02-10 | House | HTPWC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-02-03 | House | HRDLC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2023-01-23 | House | Sent to HRDLC - Referrals: HRDLC/HTPWC |