NM HB160 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-13 - [LD 55] h/cncrd SGND (Apr.8) Ch.182.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-13 - [LD 55] h/cncrd SGND (Apr.8) Ch.182.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public records availability and procedures
Title
Public records availability and procedures
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-13 | [LD 55] h/cncrd SGND (Apr.8) Ch.182. | |
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] fl/a- PASSED/S (36-0) | |
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] DP | |
2011-02-21 | [LD 35] SJC | |
2011-02-26 | [LD 40] PASSED/H (64-3) | |
2011-02-25 | [LD 39] DP | |
2011-02-13 | [LD 27] DNP-CS/DP-HHGAC | |
2011-01-20 | [LD 3] HCPAC/HHGAC-HCPAC |