NM HB158 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - [LD 19] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Require Front End License Plates

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Require Front End License Plates

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-10 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-14Senate[LD 19] Action postponed indefinitely
2018-02-14Senate[LD 19] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation
2018-02-14Senate[LD 19] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation
2018-02-13House[LD 8] Passed House (36-32)
2018-02-10House[LD 7] Motion to reconsider previous action adopted
2018-02-10House[LD 7] Failed passage in House (27-38)
2018-02-10House[LD 7] Do pass committee report adopted
2018-02-06House[LD 5] Referred to House Judiciary
2018-02-06House[LD 5] Do pass committee report adopted
2018-01-22House[LD 2] Referred to House Transportation & Public Works
2018-01-22House[LD 2] Assigned to House Transportation & Public Works and then to House Judiciary
2018-01-22House[LD 2] Printed
2018-01-22House[LD 2] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session
2018-01-22House[LD 2] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
2018-01-22House[LD 2] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business
2018-01-22House[LD 2] Not Printed

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback