NM HB156 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 13 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

County Correctional Gross Receipts Uses

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County Correctional Gross Receipts Uses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13HouseVetoed by Governor
2019-03-13SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:40 N:0
2019-03-12SenateSFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-03-08SenateSCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-02-08SenateSent to SCORC - Referrals: SCORC/SFC
2019-02-07HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:62 N:0
2019-02-04HouseHTRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-01-30HouseHLLC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-01-17HouseSent to HLLC - Referrals: HLLC/HTRC
2019-01-15HouseSent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback