NM HB151 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-14 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-14 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Nm Supreme Court Justice Salaries
Title
Nm Supreme Court Justice Salaries
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | House | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2022-02-14 | House | tabled temporarily by motion in House |
2022-02-11 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2022-02-03 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2022-01-26 | House | Sent to HJC - Referrals: HJC/HAFC |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Legislation/Legislation?chamber=H&legtype=B&legno=151&year=22 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/22%20Regular/bills/house/HB0151.pdf |