NM HB150 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 201 - Apr. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 201 - Apr. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Installment & Small Loan Changes
Title
Installment & Small Loan Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 201 - Apr. 3 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:33 N:0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2019-03-13 | Senate | SCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Sent to SCORC - Referrals: SCORC/SJC |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:53 N:15 |
2019-03-05 | House | House of Representatives Floor Amendment |
2019-03-03 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2019-02-26 | House | HCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2019-01-16 | House | Sent to HCEDC - Referrals: HCEDC/HJC |
2019-01-15 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |