NM HB147 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-12 - [LD 18] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-12 - [LD 18] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Transmitting Of Lottery Funds
Title
Transmitting Of Lottery Funds
Sponsors
Rep. James Smith [R] | Sen. John Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-10 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | Senate | [LD 18] Action postponed indefinitely |
2018-02-12 | Senate | [LD 18] Referred to Senate Finance |
2018-02-12 | Senate | [LD 18] Referred to Senate Finance |
2018-02-10 | House | [LD 7] Passed House (37-30) |
2018-02-10 | House | [LD 7] Floor amendment adoptedaa |
2018-02-08 | House | [LD 6] WITHOUT RECOMMENDATION committee report adopted and then to a |
2018-01-31 | House | [LD 4] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2018-01-31 | House | [LD 4] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2018-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Referred to House Education |
2018-01-22 | House | [LD 2] Assigned to House Education and then to House Appropriations & Finance |