NM HB147 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-30 - [LD 14] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 40
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-30 - [LD 14] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 40
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Workforce Training Residency Requirement
Title
Workforce Training Residency Requirement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-18 - Senate - (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-30 | House | [LD 14] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 40 |
2017-01-30 | House | [LD 14] h and then to cncrd |
2017-02-19 | Senate | [LD 34] Passed Senate (37-0) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | [LD 32] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-02-11 | Senate | [LD 26] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2017-02-11 | Senate | [LD 26] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-03 | Senate | [LD 18] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2017-02-03 | Senate | [LD 18] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2017-01-24 | House | [LD 8] Passed House (68-0) |
2017-01-22 | House | [LD 6] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-20 | House | [LD 4] Referred to House Business & Industry |
2017-01-20 | House | [LD 4] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-18 | House | [LD 2] HLEDC |
2017-01-18 | House | [LD 2] HLEDC and then to House Business & Industry |