NM HB146 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 20 - Mar. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Expand Biomass Income Tax Credit & Reporting

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expand Biomass Income Tax Credit & Reporting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-19HouseSigned by Governor - Chapter 20 - Mar. 4
2020-02-19SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:40 N:0
2020-02-17SenateWithdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
2020-02-13SenateSent to SFC - Referrals: SFC
2020-02-12HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:67 N:0
2020-02-08HouseHTRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2020-01-28HouseHAWC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2020-01-23HouseSent to HAWC - Referrals: HAWC/HTRC
2020-01-21HouseSent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback