NM HB146 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] h and then to cncrd Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Instructional material definitions & changes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Instructional material definitions & changes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-24House[LD 46] h and then to cncrd Vetoed by the Governor and date.
2015-03-17Senate[LD 41] Passed Senate (35-1)
2015-03-17Senate[LD 41] Do pass committee report adopted
2015-03-05Senate[LD 33] Referred to Senate Public Affairs
2015-03-05Senate[LD 33] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted
2015-02-23Senate[LD 25] Referred to Senate Education
2015-02-23Senate[LD 25] Assigned to Senate Education and then to Senate Public Affairs
2015-02-23House[LD 25] Passed House (66-0)
2015-02-19House[LD 23] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted
2015-01-30House[LD 9] Referred to House Education
2015-01-30House[LD 9] Do pass committee report adopted
2015-01-22House[LD 3] HGEIC
2015-01-22House[LD 3] HGEIC and then to House Education

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback