NM HB145 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC/SFC
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-01 - Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC/SFC
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Crime Of Illegally Dismantling A Vehicle
Title
Crime Of Illegally Dismantling A Vehicle
Sponsors
Rep. Meredith Dixon [D] | Rep. Natalie Figueroa [D] | Rep. Joy Garratt [D] | Sen. Martin Hickey [D] |
Rep. William Rehm [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | Senate | Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC/SFC |
2021-02-25 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:68 N:0 |
2021-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Floor Amendment |
2021-02-19 | House | Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2021-02-18 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-04 | House | HCPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-01-25 | House | Sent to HCPAC - Referrals: HCPAC/HJC/HAFC |