NM HB144 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 24 - Mar. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 24 - Mar. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commercial Driver's License Requirements
Title
Commercial Driver's License Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 24 - Mar. 1 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:25 N:0 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | STBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2022-02-13 | Senate | Sent to STBTC - Referrals: STBTC |
2022-02-12 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:67 N:0 |
2022-02-08 | House | HTPWC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2022-02-03 | House | HCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2022-01-25 | House | Referred to: HCEDC/HTPWC |
2022-01-25 | House | HCal: Bill falls within the purview of a 30 day session and ordered printed |
2022-01-25 | House | Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2022-01-25 | House | Not Printed |