NM HB142 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-05 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 185 - Apr. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Generating Facility And Mine Remediation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Generating Facility And Mine Remediation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-02-25 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-05HouseSigned by Governor - Chapter 185 - Apr. 5
2023-03-14SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:31 N:0
2023-03-10SenateSFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2023-02-27SenateSent to SFC - Referrals: SFC
2023-02-25HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:53 N:5
2023-02-23HouseHAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2023-02-06HouseHENRC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution
2023-01-23HouseSent to HENRC - Referrals: HENRC/HAFC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback