NM HB139 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 31 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - [LD 51] Passed Senate (26-12) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 10) Ch.155.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Lay caregiver aftercare training

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lay caregiver aftercare training

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 2 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-31Senate[LD 51] Passed Senate (26-12) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 10) Ch.155.
2015-03-17Senate[LD 41] Do pass committee report adopted
2015-03-17Senate[LD 41] Referred to Senate Public Affairs
2015-03-19House[LD 43] Passed House (54-2)
2015-03-19House[LD 43] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted
2015-02-26House[LD 28] Referred to House Judiciary
2015-02-26House[LD 28] Do pass committee report adopted
2015-02-26House[LD 28] HBEC
2015-02-26House[LD 28] Assigned to HBEC and then to House Judiciary
2015-02-04House[LD 12] HBEC
2015-02-04House[LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted
2015-01-22House[LD 3] HHC
2015-01-22House[LD 3] HHC and then to HBEC
2015-01-20House[LD 1] House Pre-file

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback