NM HB136 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Workforce solutions dept. division names
Title
Workforce solutions dept. division names
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 12 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Senate | [LD 40] Action postponed indefinitely |
2015-03-16 | Senate | [LD 40] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2015-03-16 | Senate | [LD 40] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-09 | Senate | [LD 15] Referred to Senate Rules |
2015-02-09 | Senate | [LD 15] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Public Affairs |
2015-02-09 | House | [LD 15] Passed House (43-12) |
2015-01-30 | House | [LD 9] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-01-22 | House | [LD 3] HGEIC |
2015-01-20 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |