NM HB131 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 196 - Apr. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 196 - Apr. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prosthetic & Custom Orthotic Device Coverage
Title
Prosthetic & Custom Orthotic Device Coverage
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-06 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 196 - Apr. 6 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:41 N:0 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-03-08 | Senate | STBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Sent to STBTC - Referrals: STBTC/SJC |
2023-02-14 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:68 N:0 |
2023-02-14 | House | Floor substitute adopted |
2023-02-02 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-01-27 | House | HCPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-01-19 | House | Sent to HCPAC - Referrals: HCPAC/HHHC |