NM HB131 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Post-session Lobbying Reports
Title
Post-session Lobbying Reports
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-03 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | Senate | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC |
2019-03-03 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:62 N:0 |
2019-03-03 | House | House of Representatives Floor Amendment |
2019-02-28 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-02-12 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-01-16 | House | Sent to HSEIC - Referrals: HSEIC/HJC |
2019-01-15 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |