NM HB130 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-08 - Referred to: HAFC
Pending: House Appropriations & Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-08 - Referred to: HAFC
Pending: House Appropriations & Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School Gifted Education Requirements
Title
School Gifted Education Requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | House | Referred to: HAFC |
2021-02-16 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-04 | House | HEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-01-19 | House | Sent to HEC - Referrals: HEC/HSEIC |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=H&legtype=B&legno=130&year=21 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/21%20Regular/bills/house/HB0130.pdf |