NM HB122 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 17 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-17 - [LD 41] Passed Senate (37-0) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 17 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-17 - [LD 41] Passed Senate (37-0) Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Scope of practice act
Title
Scope of practice act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Passed Senate (37-0) Pocket veto by the Governor. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-05 | Senate | [LD 33] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2015-03-05 | Senate | [LD 33] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-23 | Senate | [LD 25] Referred to Senate Rules |
2015-02-23 | Senate | [LD 25] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Judiciary |
2015-02-20 | House | [LD 24] Passed House (57-0) |
2015-02-10 | House | [LD 16] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-02-03 | House | [LD 11] Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-02-03 | House | [LD 11] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-03 | House | [LD 11] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-22 | House | [LD 3] HHC |
2015-01-22 | House | [LD 3] HHC and then to House Judiciary |
2015-01-20 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |