NM HB120 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-05 - [LD 18] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Adult Child Petitions For Visitation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adult Child Petitions For Visitation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-05Senate[LD 18] Action postponed indefinitely
2016-02-05Senate[LD 18] Referred to Senate Judiciary
2016-02-02House[LD 15] Passed House (67-0)
2016-02-02House[LD 15] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted
2016-02-02House[LD 15] Do not pass committee report adopted
2016-01-29House[LD 11] Referred to House Judiciary
2016-01-29House[LD 11] WITHOUT RECOMMENDATION committee report adopted
2016-01-23House[LD 5] Referred to House Health
2016-01-23House[LD 5] Assigned to House Health and then to House Judiciary
2016-01-23House[LD 5] Assigned to
2016-01-23House[LD 5] Printed
2016-01-23House[LD 5] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
2016-01-19House[LD 1] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business
2016-01-19House[LD 1] Not Printed
2016-01-19House[LD 1] House Pre-file

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback