NM HB119 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 22 - Mar. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 22 - Mar. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Adjust Certain School Distributions
Title
Adjust Certain School Distributions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 22 - Mar. 1 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:34 N:0 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | SEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2022-02-12 | Senate | Sent to SEC - Referrals: SEC |
2022-02-12 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:62 N:0 |
2022-02-08 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2022-01-26 | House | HEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2022-01-21 | House | Sent to HEC - Referrals: HEC/HAFC |