NM HB119 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-08 - SHPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-08 - SHPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Traffic Ticket Payments
Title
Traffic Ticket Payments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | Senate | SHPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Sent to SHPAC - Referrals: SHPAC/SJC |
2021-02-23 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:67 N:0 |
2021-02-16 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2021-01-28 | House | HCPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-01-19 | House | Sent to HCPAC - Referrals: HCPAC/HJC |