NM HB114 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] w/drn API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] w/drn API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Albuquerque public schools license plate
Title
Albuquerque public schools license plate
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Miera [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] w/drn API. | |
2011-02-13 | [LD 27] DP-SFC | |
2011-02-12 | [LD 26] SCORC/SFC-SCORC | |
2011-02-18 | [LD 32] DP- PASSED/H (57-8) | |
2011-02-14 | [LD 28] DP-HAFC | |
2011-01-19 | [LD 2] HTPWC/HAFC-HTPWC |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=H&legtype=B&legno=114&year=11 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/11%20Regular/bills/house/HB0114.pdf |