NM HB114 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - [LD 18] PASSED/S (35-0) SGND (Mar.8) Ch.52.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - [LD 18] PASSED/S (35-0) SGND (Mar.8) Ch.52.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Postpone fire protection fund distribution
Title
Postpone fire protection fund distribution
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-11 | [LD 18] PASSED/S (35-0) SGND (Mar.8) Ch.52. | |
2010-02-09 | [LD 16] DP | |
2010-02-08 | [LD 15] DP-SFC | |
2010-01-27 | [LD 7] SPAC/SFC-SPAC | |
2010-02-02 | [LD 11] PASSED/H (58-4) | |
2010-01-28 | [LD 8] DP | |
2010-01-26 | [LD 6] DP-HAFC | |
2010-01-20 | [LD 2] HHGAC/HAFC-HHGAC |