NM HB11 | 2021 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 5 - Dec. 22
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 5 - Dec. 22
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Medical Malpractice Changes
Title
Medical Malpractice Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-12-10 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-12-10 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-22 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 5 - Dec. 22 |
2021-12-17 | House | House has concurred with Senate Amendments |
2021-12-16 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:38 N:0 |
2021-12-16 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2021-12-10 | Senate | Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC |
2021-12-10 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:63 N:2 |
2021-12-10 | House | House of Representatives Floor Amendment |
2021-12-10 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-12-09 | House | Sent to HJC - Referrals: HJC |