NM HB105 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-12 - STBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
Pending: Senate Health and Public Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Freight Locomotive Personnel Requirements

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Freight Locomotive Personnel Requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-12SenateSTBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2023-02-21SenateSent to STBTC - Referrals: STBTC/SHPAC
2023-02-20HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:43 N:25
2023-02-20HouseHouse of Representatives Floor Amendment
2023-02-07HouseHJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution
2023-01-30HouseHLVMC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2023-01-19HouseSent to HLVMC - Referrals: HLVMC/HJC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback