NM HB103 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 13 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-13 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 13 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-13 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Utility Operator Certification Act Changes
Title
Utility Operator Certification Act Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-13 | House | Vetoed by Governor |
2021-03-13 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:37 N:1 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | STBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-03-02 | Senate | SCONC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Sent to SCONC - Referrals: SCONC/STBTC |
2021-02-22 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:67 N:0 |
2021-02-16 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2021-02-02 | House | HENRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-01-19 | House | Sent to HENRC - Referrals: HENRC/HSEIC |
2021-01-19 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |