NM HB102 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 46 - Mar. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 46 - Mar. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Entity-level Tax Income & Payment
Title
Entity-level Tax Income & Payment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 46 - Mar. 8 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:28 N:0 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | STBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2022-02-13 | Senate | Sent to STBTC - Referrals: STBTC |
2022-02-12 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:68 N:0 |
2022-02-07 | House | HTRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2022-01-31 | House | HCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2022-01-20 | House | Sent to HCEDC - Referrals: HCEDC/HTRC |