NM HB10 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 12 - Mar. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 12 - Mar. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
No Reduced School Meal Copayments
Title
No Reduced School Meal Copayments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 12 - Mar. 2 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:39 N:0 |
2020-02-17 | Senate | SEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-02-15 | Senate | Sent to SEC - Referrals: SEC |
2020-02-14 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:67 N:0 |
2020-02-12 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2020-02-08 | House | HEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-01-24 | House | Sent to HEC - Referrals: HEC/HAFC |