NM HB1 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-19 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 1 - Jan. 19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Feed Bill

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Feed Bill

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-01-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-17 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-19HouseSigned by Governor - Chapter 1 - Jan. 19
2024-01-18SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:36 N:0
2024-01-18SenateSFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2024-01-17SenateSent to SFC - Referrals: SFC
2024-01-17HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:52 N:13
2024-01-17HouseHAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2024-01-16HouseSent to HAFC - Referrals: HAFC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback