NM HB1 | 2017 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - [LD 3] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 2(partial veto).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Supplemental General Appropriations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supplemental General Appropriations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26House[LD 3] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 2(partial veto).
2017-05-27Senate[LD 4] Passed Senate (37-4)
2017-05-27Senate[LD 4] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
2017-05-26Senate[LD 3] Tabled temporarily by motion and then to S
2017-05-25House[LD 2] Passed House (46-20)
2017-05-24House[LD 1] Do pass committee report adopted
2017-05-24House[LD 1] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance
2017-05-24House[LD 1] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback