NJ SR57 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Respectfully urges MVC to reopen office in City of Elizabeth.*
Title
Respectfully urges MVC to reopen office in City of Elizabeth.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Resolution Passed Senate (Voice) |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AR149 (Same As) 2018-04-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee