NJ SR44 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-21 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-21 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. to utilize existing commerce within Port Newark regarding recent safety recalls to ensure the most effective coordination and completion of recall activities.
Title
Urges Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. to utilize existing commerce within Port Newark regarding recent safety recalls to ensure the most effective coordination and completion of recall activities.
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Rice [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-21 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2010-05-20 | Passed by the Senate (Voice) | |
2010-05-10 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-22 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/SR44 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/SR/44_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SR44 |