NJ SR17 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SR143
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Congress to enact legislation to codify Deferred Action for Childhood Arrivals (DACA) program.
Title
Urges Congress to enact legislation to codify Deferred Action for Childhood Arrivals (DACA) program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Resolution Passed Senate (Voice) |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SR143 (Carry Over) 2017-12-11 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/SR17 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/SR/17_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SR17 |