NJ SJR86 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-14 - Approved P.L.2022, JR-7.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Designates October 15th of each year as "New Jersey Railroad Workers Day."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates October 15th of each year as "New Jersey Railroad Workers Day."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-10-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for AJR165 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-10-14AssemblyApproved P.L.2022, JR-7.
2022-10-03AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-0-0)
2022-10-03AssemblySubstituted for AJR165
2022-09-29AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2022-09-29SenatePassed by the Senate (35-0)
2022-06-09SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2022-05-16SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee

Same As/Similar To

AJR165 (Same As) 2022-10-03 - Substituted by SJR86

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback