NJ SJR81 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Congress to enact legislation allowing distributions from 529 plans to be used for expenses associated with registered apprenticeship programs.*
Title
Urges Congress to enact legislation allowing distributions from 529 plans to be used for expenses associated with registered apprenticeship programs.*
Sponsors
Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Thomas Kean [R] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR117 (Same As) 2018-04-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee