NJ SJR77 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Substituted by AJR114
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Substituted by AJR114
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates last full week of July of each year as "Buy Local Week."
Title
Designates last full week of July of each year as "Buy Local Week."
Sponsors
Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-10-18 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Senate | Substituted by AJR114 |
2018-10-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR114 (Same As) 2019-05-13 - Approved P.L.2019, JR-12.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/SJR77 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/SJR/77_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SJR77 |