NJ SJR73 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Approved P.L.2019, JR-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Approved P.L.2019, JR-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Urges U.S. Congress to pass "Military Hunger Prevention Act."
Title
Urges U.S. Congress to pass "Military Hunger Prevention Act."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for AJR132 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for AJR132 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, JR-21. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0) |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Substituted for AJR132 (1R) |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2018-09-27 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR132 (Same As) 2019-06-27 - Substituted by SJR73 (1R)