NJ SJR73 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR99
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - Approved P.L.2017, JR-20.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - Approved P.L.2017, JR-20.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates September 21 of each year as "Evans Syndrome Awareness Day."
Title
Designates September 21 of each year as "Evans Syndrome Awareness Day."
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For Ajr16 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2017, JR-20. |
2017-12-07 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-0-0) |
2017-12-07 | Assembly | Substituted for AJR16 (1R) |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-09-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
2016-09-15 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2016-08-01 | Senate | Senate Amendment (34-0) (Greenstein) |
2016-07-14 | Senate | Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading |
Same As/Similar To
AJR16 (Same As) 2017-12-07 - Substituted by SJR73 (1R)
AJR99 (Carry Over) 2015-02-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
AJR99 (Carry Over) 2015-02-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee